E
|
05/19/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
E
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1656
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3468
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1649
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2907
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#988
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote RV#988
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amended
|
3-C. Bell
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-C. Bell
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-C. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2906
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2799
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2799
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#893
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Lujan
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 5217
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1397
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1391
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 527
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|