LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB2044
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB2044
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB2044
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/19/2023
8:30 am
Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
SCR26
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
SB592
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1595
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1613
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB1860
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2044
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB2220
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2530
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM