Senate | 04/24/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1236 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 531 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |