Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |