Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 17, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023