1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2139 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the establishment of the Opportunity High School |
---|
6 | 6 | | Diploma program. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | adding Subchapter O to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SUBCHAPTER O. OPPORTUNITY HIGH SCHOOL DIPLOMA PROGRAM |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 130.451. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher |
---|
13 | 13 | | Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (2) "General academic teaching institution" has the |
---|
15 | 15 | | meaning assigned by Section 61.003. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (3) "Program," unless the context indicates |
---|
17 | 17 | | otherwise, means the Opportunity High School Diploma program |
---|
18 | 18 | | established under this subchapter. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 130.452. PURPOSE. The purpose of the program is to |
---|
20 | 20 | | provide an alternative means by which adult students enrolled in a |
---|
21 | 21 | | workforce education program at a public junior college may earn a |
---|
22 | 22 | | high school diploma at the college through concurrent enrollment in |
---|
23 | 23 | | a competency-based education program that enables students to |
---|
24 | 24 | | demonstrate knowledge substantially equivalent to the knowledge |
---|
25 | 25 | | required to earn a high school diploma in this state. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 130.453. ADMINISTRATION. The coordinating board shall |
---|
27 | 27 | | administer the program in consultation with the Texas Education |
---|
28 | 28 | | Agency and the Texas Workforce Commission. |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 130.454. APPROVAL OF ALTERNATIVE HIGH SCHOOL DIPLOMA |
---|
30 | 30 | | PROGRAM. (a) A public junior college may submit to the |
---|
31 | 31 | | coordinating board an application to participate in the program. |
---|
32 | 32 | | The application must propose an alternative competency-based high |
---|
33 | 33 | | school diploma program to be offered for concurrent enrollment to |
---|
34 | 34 | | adult students without a high school diploma who are enrolled in a |
---|
35 | 35 | | workforce education program at the college. The proposed program |
---|
36 | 36 | | may include any combination of instruction, curriculum, |
---|
37 | 37 | | achievement, internships, or other means by which a student may |
---|
38 | 38 | | attain knowledge sufficient to adequately prepare the student for |
---|
39 | 39 | | postsecondary education or additional workforce education. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (b) A public junior college may submit an application under |
---|
41 | 41 | | Subsection (a) together with one or more public junior colleges, |
---|
42 | 42 | | general academic teaching institutions, public school districts, |
---|
43 | 43 | | or nonprofit organizations with whom the proposed program described |
---|
44 | 44 | | by that subsection will be offered as provided by Subsection (e). |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) The coordinating board may approve not more than five |
---|
46 | 46 | | public junior colleges to participate in the program. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (d) Subject to Subsection (c), the coordinating board shall |
---|
48 | 48 | | review and approve a public junior college's application to |
---|
49 | 49 | | participate in the program if the board determines that the |
---|
50 | 50 | | college's proposed program described by Subsection (a) will provide |
---|
51 | 51 | | instruction and assessments appropriate to ensure that a student |
---|
52 | 52 | | who successfully completes the proposed program demonstrates |
---|
53 | 53 | | levels of knowledge sufficient to adequately prepare the student |
---|
54 | 54 | | for postsecondary education or additional workforce education. The |
---|
55 | 55 | | coordinating board may coordinate with the Texas Education Agency |
---|
56 | 56 | | as necessary to make a determination under this subsection. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (e) A public junior college approved to participate in the |
---|
58 | 58 | | program may: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (1) enter into an agreement with one or more public |
---|
60 | 60 | | junior colleges, general academic teaching institutions, public |
---|
61 | 61 | | school districts, or nonprofit organizations to offer the program |
---|
62 | 62 | | described by Subsection (a); and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (2) offer the program described by Subsection (a) at |
---|
64 | 64 | | any campus of the college or an entity with which the college has |
---|
65 | 65 | | entered into an agreement under Subdivision (1). |
---|
66 | 66 | | Sec. 130.455. AWARD OF HIGH SCHOOL DIPLOMA. (a) A public |
---|
67 | 67 | | junior college participating in the program may award a high school |
---|
68 | 68 | | diploma to a student enrolled in the alternative competency-based |
---|
69 | 69 | | high school diploma program offered by the college under the |
---|
70 | 70 | | program if the student performs satisfactorily on assessment |
---|
71 | 71 | | instruments prescribed by coordinating board rule. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (b) A high school diploma awarded under the program is |
---|
73 | 73 | | equivalent to a high school diploma awarded under Section 28.025. |
---|
74 | 74 | | Sec. 130.456. FUNDING. (a) The coordinating board and the |
---|
75 | 75 | | Texas Workforce Commission shall coordinate to jointly identify |
---|
76 | 76 | | funding mechanisms, including grants, interagency contracts, |
---|
77 | 77 | | financial aid, or subsidies, available to public junior colleges |
---|
78 | 78 | | and students to encourage and facilitate participation in the |
---|
79 | 79 | | program. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (b) A public junior college participating in the program is |
---|
81 | 81 | | entitled to receive funding under Section 130.003 for the program |
---|
82 | 82 | | in the manner provided by coordinating board rule. |
---|
83 | 83 | | Sec. 130.457. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2026, the |
---|
84 | 84 | | coordinating board shall submit to the legislature a progress |
---|
85 | 85 | | report on the effectiveness of the program and any recommendations |
---|
86 | 86 | | for legislative or other action. This section expires |
---|
87 | 87 | | September 1, 2027. |
---|
88 | 88 | | Sec. 130.458. RULES. The coordinating board may adopt |
---|
89 | 89 | | rules as necessary to implement this subchapter. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
91 | 91 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
92 | 92 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
93 | 93 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
94 | 94 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
95 | 95 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
96 | 96 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
97 | 97 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2139 passed the Senate on |
---|
98 | 98 | | April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
99 | 99 | | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 19, 2023, by the |
---|
100 | 100 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
101 | 101 | | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | 102 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
103 | 103 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2139 passed the House, with |
---|
104 | 104 | | amendment, on May 17, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
105 | 105 | | Nays 3, one present not voting. |
---|
106 | 106 | | ______________________________ |
---|
107 | 107 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
108 | 108 | | Approved: |
---|
109 | 109 | | ______________________________ |
---|
110 | 110 | | Date |
---|
111 | 111 | | ______________________________ |
---|
112 | 112 | | Governor |
---|