Senate | 04/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1309 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 537 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |