Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2151 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 S Referred to Transportation