Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2178 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/09/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            88R8798 JG-D
 By: LaMantia S.B. No. 2178


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Autism Medicaid Services
 Program Advisory Council to evaluate the provision of applied
 behavior analysis services under Medicaid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle E, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 111 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 111. AUTISM MEDICAID SERVICES PROGRAM ADVISORY COUNCIL
 Sec. 111.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Advisory council" means the Autism Medicaid
 Services Program Advisory Council established under this chapter.
 (2)  "Medicaid managed care organization" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
 (3)  "Program" means the autism Medicaid services
 program administered by the commission under Medicaid to provide
 applied behavior analysis services to recipients with autism
 spectrum disorder.
 (4)  "Recipient" has the meaning assigned by Section
 533.001, Government Code.
 Sec. 111.002.  PURPOSE. The purpose of the Autism Medicaid
 Services Program Advisory Council is to:
 (1)  create a structured forum by convening relevant
 stakeholders to evaluate and advise the commission on issues and
 concerns relating to the provision of applied behavior analysis
 services under the program;
 (2)  provide a structured forum through which
 recipients receiving services under the program and the public are
 able to provide input on the provision of applied behavior analysis
 services under the program; and
 (3)  assess and provide reports on the program in
 accordance with this chapter.
 Sec. 111.003.  ESTABLISHMENT OF ADVISORY COUNCIL. The
 advisory council is established to advise the commission and
 legislature on the provision of applied behavior analysis services
 to recipients under the program, including the implementation and
 efficacy of the program.
 Sec. 111.004.  MEMBERSHIP. (a) The advisory council is
 composed of the following members appointed by the executive
 commissioner:
 (1)  at least one commission employee who provides
 technical support for the program;
 (2)  at least one Texas Medicaid and Healthcare
 Partnership employee who provides technical support for the
 program;
 (3)  at least three representatives of Medicaid managed
 care organizations participating in the program;
 (4)  at least four representatives of licensed behavior
 analysts participating in the program that represent a variety of
 operational sizes;
 (5)  at least one representative of a licensed
 diagnosing provider of applied behavior analysis participating in
 the program;
 (6)  at least one representative of an advocacy and
 support group for individuals that represents persons with autism
 spectrum disorder in this state;
 (7)  at least one member who is a parent of a child who
 has been diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder and qualifies for
 participation in or receives services under the program; and
 (8)  any other person the executive commissioner
 determines appropriate who has appropriate subject matter
 expertise in autism, the program, or another relevant area.
 (b)  Each advisory council member must be a resident of this
 state.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall select from among the
 advisory council members a presiding officer. In the event of a tie
 on a matter voted on by the advisory council, the presiding officer
 shall cast the deciding vote.
 (d)  An advisory council member is not entitled to
 compensation or reimbursement for expenses incurred in performing
 advisory council duties.
 Sec. 111.005.  TERMS AND VACANCY. (a) Advisory council
 members serve two-year terms.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall fill a vacancy on the
 advisory council in the same manner as the original appointment for
 the remainder of the unexpired term.
 (c)  An advisory council member may be reappointed to serve
 on the advisory council.
 Sec. 111.006.  MEETINGS. (a)  The advisory council shall
 meet at times and locations as determined by the presiding officer
 or a majority of the advisory council members.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Chapter 551, Government Code, or any
 other law, the advisory council may meet by telephone conference
 call, videoconference, or another similar telecommunication
 method. A meeting held by telephone conference call,
 videoconference, or another similar telecommunication method is
 subject to the requirements of Sections 551.125(c)-(f), Government
 Code.
 (c)  A majority of the advisory council members constitutes a
 quorum.
 Sec. 111.007.  ANNUAL REPORT. (a) Not later than November 1
 of each year, the advisory council shall prepare and submit to the
 executive commissioner, the commission's executive council
 established under Section 531.0051, Government Code, the governor,
 and the legislature an electronic written report that includes:
 (1)  the total program budget for the preceding fiscal
 year;
 (2)  the total amount of money spent to provide
 reimbursements under the program for the provision of applied
 behavior analysis services during:
 (A)  the preceding fiscal year under the program
 to provide reimbursements for the provision of applied behavior
 analysis services; and
 (B)  the period beginning on the date the program
 was established to the 30th day preceding the date the report is
 prepared;
 (3)  the total number of recipients who received
 applied behavior analysis services under the program during:
 (A)  the preceding fiscal year; and
 (B)  the period beginning on the date the program
 was established to the 30th day preceding the date the report is
 prepared;
 (4)  the total number of projected recipients who will
 receive applied behavior analysis services under the program for
 the current fiscal year;
 (5)  the minutes of each advisory council meeting
 conducted during the preceding fiscal year, including any written
 public comments and transcribed oral public comments; and
 (6)  an analysis of barriers to:
 (A)  the program's efficiency;
 (B)  access to applied behavior analysis services
 under the program; and
 (C)  program network adequacy, including
 recommendations for improving program efficiency.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, this section, including
 any action taken under this section to develop or disseminate
 information or materials, does not create a civil or administrative
 cause of action or a civil or criminal liability and does not create
 a standard of care, obligation, or duty that provides the basis for
 a cause of action.
 Sec. 111.008.  APPLICABILITY OF OTHER LAW. Chapter 2110,
 Government Code, does not apply to the advisory council.
 Sec. 111.009.  SUNSET PROVISION. The advisory council is
 subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the advisory
 council is abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2029.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than March 1, 2024, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 appoint members to the Autism Medicaid Services Program Advisory
 Council as required by Chapter 111, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Chapter 111, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, the Autism Medicaid Services Program Advisory
 Council established under that chapter is not required to submit
 the first report under that chapter until November 1, 2024.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.