House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|