Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2209 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 1, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023