Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB221 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 12, 2023
Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 11, 2023