Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2212 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/25/2023

                    By: Blanco S.B. No. 2212
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2023; March 22, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 25, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 25, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2212 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disclosure by a pharmacy to a patient of certain
 price information for a drug or biological product.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 562.003, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 562.003.  DISCLOSURE OF PRICE; PATIENT'S OPTION.  (a)  A
 pharmacy shall disclose the lowest cost cash price at that pharmacy
 for the drug or biological product prescribed to the patient.
 (b)  If the price of a drug or biological product to a patient
 is lower than the amount of the patient's copayment under the
 patient's prescription drug insurance plan, the pharmacist shall
 offer the patient the option of paying for the drug or biological
 product at the lower price instead of paying the amount of the
 copayment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *