House | 05/22/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4997 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 3345 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3345 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1517 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 1516 |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1516 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1541 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1400 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3345 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |