Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 7, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023