Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2275 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 2275
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 22, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 2; April 12, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Supreme Court of Texas to adopt
 certain rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.004(c), Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *