Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2275 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 1, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 12, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023