E
|
05/15/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
E
|
05/04/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2349
|
Journal Page: 2591
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2792
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2620
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1636
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1022
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1022
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1022
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|