E | 06/02/2023 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 06/02/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
E | 05/19/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4827 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2130 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4574 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#1817 | Journal Page: 4574 |
House | 05/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4574 | |
House | 05/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4573 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4466 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#1794 | Journal Page: 4465 |
House | 05/17/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4465 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4465 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4317 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1469 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 943 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 943 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 943 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 942 |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |