Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 18, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Bill March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 29, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023