House | 05/02/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1444 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1444 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1282 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 705 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1444 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 342 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |