1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 2304 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the regulation of driver education courses and driving |
---|
6 | 6 | | safety courses and the provision of information regarding the Texas |
---|
7 | 7 | | Driving with Disability Program to certain public school students. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 29.0113 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 29.0113. DRIVING WITH DISABILITY PROGRAM INFORMATION. |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) Each school district and open-enrollment charter school shall |
---|
13 | 13 | | provide information regarding the Texas Driving with Disability |
---|
14 | 14 | | Program to: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) students who have a health condition or disability |
---|
16 | 16 | | that may impede effective communication with a peace officer and: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (A) who receive special education services under |
---|
18 | 18 | | Subchapter A; or |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) who are covered by Section 504, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section 794); and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) the parents of students described by Subdivision |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1). |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The information described under Subsection (a) shall be |
---|
24 | 24 | | provided to each student who is 16 years of age or older and |
---|
25 | 25 | | annually until the earlier of the student's: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) graduation from high school; or |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) 21st birthday. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) The agency shall collaborate with the Department of |
---|
29 | 29 | | Public Safety, the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles, and the |
---|
30 | 30 | | Governor's Committee on People with Disabilities to develop the |
---|
31 | 31 | | information materials to be provided under Subsection (a). The |
---|
32 | 32 | | materials: |
---|
33 | 33 | | (1) must include information regarding a person's |
---|
34 | 34 | | option to voluntarily list any health condition or disability that |
---|
35 | 35 | | may impede the person's communication with a peace officer on a |
---|
36 | 36 | | person's vehicle registration information in accordance with |
---|
37 | 37 | | Section 502.061, Transportation Code, or application for an |
---|
38 | 38 | | original license under Section 521.142, Transportation Code; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) may be provided with any transition planning |
---|
40 | 40 | | materials provided under this subchapter. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 2. Section 1001.001, Education Code, is amended by |
---|
42 | 42 | | amending Subdivisions (2) and (14) to read as follows: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (2) "Classroom instruction" includes instruction |
---|
44 | 44 | | provided: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) in a traditional classroom setting or through |
---|
46 | 46 | | other physical means or remotely through the Internet; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (B) by an in-person driver education provider in |
---|
48 | 48 | | the manner described by Paragraph (A). |
---|
49 | 49 | | (14) "In-person driver education provider" means a |
---|
50 | 50 | | business that provides driver education courses in person, |
---|
51 | 51 | | including behind-the-wheel instruction, classroom instruction, |
---|
52 | 52 | | observation instruction, or driver's license examinations. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is |
---|
54 | 54 | | amended by adding Section 1001.10161 to read as follows: |
---|
55 | 55 | | Sec. 1001.10161. DRIVING WITH DISABILITY PROGRAM |
---|
56 | 56 | | INFORMATION. The commission by rule shall require that information |
---|
57 | 57 | | relating to the Texas Driving with Disability Program be included |
---|
58 | 58 | | in the curriculum of each driver education and driving safety |
---|
59 | 59 | | course. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 4. (a) Not later than May 1, 2024, the Texas |
---|
61 | 61 | | Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules |
---|
62 | 62 | | required by Section 1001.10161, Education Code, as added by this |
---|
63 | 63 | | Act. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (b) Not later than September 1, 2024, each provider of a |
---|
65 | 65 | | driver education course or a driving safety course shall certify to |
---|
66 | 66 | | the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation that the course |
---|
67 | 67 | | curriculum has been updated to include the information required by |
---|
68 | 68 | | Section 1001.10161, Education Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 5. This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024 |
---|
70 | 70 | | school year. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
72 | 72 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
73 | 73 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
74 | 74 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
75 | 75 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
76 | 76 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
77 | 77 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
78 | 78 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2304 passed the Senate on |
---|
79 | 79 | | May 3, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
80 | 80 | | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | 81 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
82 | 82 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2304 passed the House on |
---|
83 | 83 | | May 22, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 11, one |
---|
84 | 84 | | present not voting. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
87 | 87 | | Approved: |
---|
88 | 88 | | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | 89 | | Date |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | Governor |
---|