E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6425
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2244
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3234
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5971
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5971
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5974
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5974
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5974
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3093
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5066
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2002
|
Journal Page: 5065
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5065
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Amended
|
2-Raney
|
Journal Page: 5064
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
Journal Page: 5064
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5063
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4944
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Button
|
Journal Page: 4944
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4944
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1229
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 577
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|