Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2316 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 88R15828 JRJ-F
22 By: Hughes S.B. No. 2316
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to service requirements of certain current or former
88 members of the Texas National Guard, the Texas Air National Guard,
99 or a reserve component of the armed forces of the United States for
1010 tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of higher
1111 education.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Section 54.341(a), Education Code, is amended to
1414 read as follows:
1515 (a) The governing board of each institution of higher
1616 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
1717 tuition, dues, fees, and other required charges, including fees for
1818 correspondence courses but excluding general deposit fees, student
1919 services fees, and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or
2020 clothing, provided the person seeking the exemption currently
2121 resides in this state and entered the service at a location in this
2222 state, declared this state as the person's home of record in the
2323 manner provided by the applicable military or other service, or
2424 would have been determined to be a resident of this state for
2525 purposes of Subchapter B at the time the person entered the service:
2626 (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
2727 armed forces of the United States who served during the
2828 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
2929 (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
3030 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
3131 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
3232 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
3333 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
3434 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
3535 person be discharged from service;
3636 (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the
3737 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
3838 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
3939 the Korean War; [and]
4040 (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the
4141 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
4242 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
4343 portion of their active duty during:
4444 (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the
4545 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3);
4646 (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
4747 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
4848 (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
4949 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
5050 (D) the Panama era which began on December 20,
5151 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
5252 (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
5353 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
5454 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
5555 (F) the national emergency by reason of certain
5656 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
5757 (G) any future national emergency declared in
5858 accordance with federal law; and
5959 (5) all persons not otherwise described by Subdivision
6060 (4) who were honorably discharged from a reserve component of the
6161 armed forces of the United States, the Texas National Guard, or the
6262 Texas Air National Guard after serving for a continuous period of at
6363 least 20 years in the applicable military service.
6464 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.