Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 26, 2023
Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 30, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 30, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023