House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2340 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Middleton | Journal Page: 1352 |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 593 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |