E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3017
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2765
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5176
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5183
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2039
|
Journal Page: 5183
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5183
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5183
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5168
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5168
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3712
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1675
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1672
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3850
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|