E
|
05/27/2023
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
September 1, 2024
|
|
E
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
E
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4384
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1580
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3468
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Perry
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 166
|
Senate
|
11/16/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|