House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
6/1/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1)
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5104
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 657
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 375
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|