Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 11/21/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/21/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |