Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2448 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2448


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of funds appropriated by the Department of State
 Health Services to deliver low-dose, at-home racemic ketamine via
 telehealth to improve healthcare access and mental health outcomes
 across rural and high-risk populations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1001.203, Health and Safety Code is
 amended by adding Section 1001.2032 to read as follows:
 (1)  The purpose of this Act is to provide for expanded
 healthcare access, reduced care costs, improved mental health,
 reduced chronic pain, increased workforce productivity, improved
 trauma management for first responders and active military, and
 improved health rankings for rural and high-risk populations across
 Texas by authorizing the Department of State Health Services to
 fund low-dose, at-home ketamine using medical technology in the
 form of targeted intranasal delivery that can optimize the
 effectiveness of and reduce the potential side effects related to
 racemic ketamine treatments.
 (2)  The Department of State Health Services shall direct
 funding to treat rural health population, first responders,
 veterans, and activity military with a clinical diagnosis of
 depression, post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety, and chronic
 pain. The Department of State Health Services shall allocate a
 total of $55,000,000 for the purpose of providing funding during
 the state fiscal years ending August 31, 2024 and August 31, 2025
 for the treatment of at least 15,000 adults that are designated as
 living in a rural area of Texas, at least 8,000 first responders,
 and at least 6,000 veterans or active military.
 (3)  The Department of State Health Services shall transfer
 the appropriations through contracts with low-dose, at-home
 racemic ketamine service providers that utilize targeted
 intranasal drug delivery. When treating mental health and
 neurological conditions, which requires the delivery of
 pharmaceutical agents to the brain, it is well understood that
 using oral administration is the least efficient and problematic
 route and intravenous or intramuscular administration prohibits
 at-home, self-administration, which is required to maximize access
 to care. The most optimized route of administration is intranasal,
 where certain regions of the nasal anatomy provide optimized
 pathways for drug delivery that can eliminate side effects that can
 reduce treatment compliance and maximize potential health
 outcomes. The treatment protocol shall not exceed 30 to 60
 milligrams of racemic ketamine per individual treatment and shall
 not exceed a total of 180 to 360 milligrams of racemic ketamine for
 the entire treatment program, as this sub-anesthetic and low-dose
 treatment protocol will minimize the potential for side-effects.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution, and shall
 expire September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3: The Department of State Health Services required
 to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for the purpose stated in SECTION 1 if this Act. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Department of State Health Services may, but is not
 required to, implement this Act using other appropriations
 available for the purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.