Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 135 | |
Senate | 11/22/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |