E | 06/18/2023 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3310 | |
E | 05/29/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2966 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2543 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2502 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5063 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Record vote | RV#2001 | Journal Page: 5063 |
House | 05/23/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 5063 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5062 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4944 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4944 | |
House | 05/20/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4609 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 3063 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3063 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2338 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3063 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |