Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2489 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sparks S.B. No. 2489
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2023; March 23, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 May 8, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2023, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2489 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing prevocational or similar services under
 certain Medicaid waiver programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0755 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0755.  PREVOCATIONAL SERVICES UNDER CERTAIN WAIVER
 PROGRAMS. (a)  In this section, "prevocational services" means
 services that are designed to prepare an individual for paid or
 unpaid work and achieve a generalized result rather than being
 job-task oriented.
 (b)  Prevocational services provided under the community
 living assistance and support services (CLASS) waiver program or
 another medical assistance waiver program providing long-term
 services or supports to a medical assistance recipient must be
 designed to assist the recipient in achieving permanent integrated
 employment receiving compensation at or above the minimum wage in
 the recipient's community and in accordance with state and federal
 law.
 (c)  The commission shall seek a waiver or other necessary
 authorization from the appropriate federal agency to include
 prevocational services as part of the individualized skills and
 socialization services delivered under a medical assistance waiver
 program providing long-term services and supports.
 (d)  If the commission's request for a waiver or other
 authorization under Subsection (c) is not granted, the commission
 shall collaborate with relevant stakeholders and applicable
 federal agencies to establish a service similar to prevocational
 services in a manner that is authorized by federal law.
 (e)  If the commission is granted a waiver or other
 authorization under Subsection (d):
 (1)  the reimbursement rate for the service the
 commission establishes under that subsection may not exceed the
 reimbursement rate for individualized skills and socialization
 services; and
 (2)  if the service is combined with individualized
 skills and socialization services, the commission shall ensure the
 service may not exceed the total allowable hours or the total costs
 for individualized skills and socialization services provided
 under a service plan.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 apply for and actively pursue from the appropriate federal agency
 the waiver or other authorization required by Section 32.0755(c),
 Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.  The commission may
 delay implementing other provisions of this Act until the waiver or
 other authorization applied for under that subsection is granted.
 (b)  If the waiver or other authorization under Section
 32.0755(c), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act, is not
 granted, the Health and Human Services Commission shall, not later
 than the 60th day after the date the waiver or other authorization
 is denied, apply for a waiver or other authorization under Section
 32.0755(d), Human Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *