Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2565 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023