Senate | 05/17/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2001 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1400 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |