Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 24, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023

Enrolled

Analysis June 14, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2023