Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis January 31, 2024
Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023