Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 26, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 12, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023