House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2047 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1230 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 775 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |