E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4827
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2013
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1760
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4401
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4365
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1743
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4364
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2042
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|