House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | 6/1/23 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3984 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 3984 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3984 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 5351 | Journal Page: 3984 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2785 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2785 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2576 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2785 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 864 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |