Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis July 19, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis July 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023