E
|
05/23/2023
|
Effective on 1/1/24
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
E
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4045
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1751
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1708
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1308
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 5324
|
Journal Page: 3487
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3713
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2339
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1401
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1238
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2464
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 915
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|