Senate | 05/30/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 4529 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4529 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4563 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2066 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2000 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1491 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4529 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |