Senate | 05/30/2023 | Recommendations filed with the Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3702 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3467 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1647 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1647 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1647 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1647 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1595 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1541 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1491 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3702 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |