Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2616 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 30, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 2, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis July 12, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2023