Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Recommendations filed with the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 5170
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
Journal Page: 5170
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4563
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4529
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|