Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2629 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/12/2023 8:30 am
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 15 2023 12:20PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately