Senate | 05/03/2023 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 12/07/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/07/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |